Senate | 06/25/2020 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. | ||
Senate | 06/24/2020 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 06/24/2020 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 67, nays 34. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 06/23/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/24/20. | ||
House | 06/23/2020 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 06/23/2020 | Rules suspended. | ||
House | 06/23/2020 | Reported with amendments (16-0). | ||
House | 06/17/2020 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 06/16/2020 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |