House
|
07/02/2020
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2020
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2020
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2020
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2020
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2020
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2020
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2020
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2020
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2020
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2020
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2020
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 102, nays 0. The resolution, having the required two-thirds vote of the elected members, was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2020
|
Made Special Order of the day No. 5 for 06/10/20.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2020
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2020
|
Reported favorably (21-0).
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|