HLS 201ES-244 ORIGINAL 2020 First Extraordinary Session HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOL UTION NO. 15 BY REPRESENTATIVE FREEMAN LEGISLATIVE COMMITTEES: Provides relative to a special advisory committee for redistricting 1 A CONCURRENT RESOL UTION 2To create the Special Advisory Committee for Redistricting to study and make 3 recommendations to the legislature and the public regarding redistricting. 4 WHEREAS, the drawing of electoral districts is among the most important duties of 5the legislature; and 6 WHEREAS, increasing transparency and public participation in the redistricting 7process and promoting public commentary and discussion about redistricting may help the 8legislature to explore a broader range of representational possibilities relative to 9configuration of districts around various communities of interest; and 10 WHEREAS, the creation of a special advisory committee, composed of persons 11representing the diversity of the state, may facilitate public participation in the redistricting 12process and result in better redistricting decision making. 13 THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby 14create the Special Advisory Committee for Redistricting to study and make 15recommendations to the legislature and the public regarding redistricting. 16 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the special advisory committee shall be 17composed of the following members: 18 (1) A non-voting chairman selected by the chairman of the House Committee on 19House and Governmental Affairs and the chairman of the Senate Committee on Senate and 20Governmental Affairs, acting jointly. Page 1 of 4 HLS 201ES-244 ORIGINAL HCR NO. 15 1 (2) Three persons selected by the speaker of the House of Representatives, who shall 2reflect the demographic diversity of the state of Louisiana specifically in gender, race, 3ethnicity, and political party affiliation, but who shall not be legislators. 4 (3) Three persons selected by the president of the Senate, who shall reflect the 5demographic diversity of the state of Louisiana specifically in gender, race, ethnicity, and 6political party affiliation, but who shall not be legislators. 7 (4) Three persons selected by the governor, who shall reflect the demographic 8diversity of the state of Louisiana specifically in gender, race, ethnicity, and political party 9affiliation. 10 (5) One person selected by the chief justice of the supreme court. 11 (6) One person selected by the secretary of state. 12 (7) One person selected by the chair of the Democratic Party of Louisiana. 13 (8) One person selected by the chair of the Republican Party of Louisiana. 14 (9) One person selected by the chair of the Independent Party of Louisiana. 15 (10) One person selected by the speaker of the House of Representatives and the 16president of the Senate, acting jointly, who is either an academic or legal professional or a 17demographer with relevant knowledge of or experience with the redistricting process in 18Louisiana. 19 (11) Two persons selected by the special advisory committee as representatives from 20nonprofit civic organizations, who shall reflect the demographic diversity of the state of 21Louisiana specifically in gender, race, ethnicity, and political party affiliation. 22 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that any vacancy on the special advisory committee 23shall be filled in the manner of initial selection as soon as possible. 24 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the special advisory committee shall study and 25make recommendations to the legislature and the public regarding all of the following: 26 (1) Past redistricting proceedings including, at minimum, those from the two most 27recent redistricting cycles. 28 (2) Best redistricting practices established in other states. Page 2 of 4 HLS 201ES-244 ORIGINAL HCR NO. 15 1 (3) Redistricting tools and resources that have become available since the most 2recently completed redistricting cycle, including digital map-drawing tools, redistricting 3algorithms, and other technological resources. 4 (4) Proposed redistricting plans. 5 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that no later than July 1, 2020, the speaker of the 6House of Representatives and the president of the Senate shall send written notice of their 7intent to constitute the special advisory committee to all members of the legislature, the 8governor, the chief justice of the supreme court, the secretary of state, and the chairs of the 9Democratic, Republican, and Independent parties of Louisiana with a request that selections 10to the special advisory committee made pursuant to this Resolution be submitted not later 11than July 31, 2020. 12 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the special advisory committee shall hold its 13organizational meeting no later than August 15, 2020, to establish a meeting schedule to 14enable the committee to perform its functions and duties in the manner required by this 15Resolution and to conduct any other business deemed necessary. 16 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the special advisory committee shall report its 17findings and recommendations to the legislature no later than March 1, 2021 and may make 18additional recommendations to the legislature until December 31, 2021, after which time 19it shall be dissolved. 20 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that speaker of the House of Representatives and the 21president of the Senate shall designate appropriate staff to provide assistance to the special 22advisory committee in carrying out its duties and that the special advisory committee may 23call upon the staffs of any department, agency, or official of the state for data and assistance, 24and all such departments, agencies, and officials shall cooperate with the special advisory 25committee. 26 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the members of the special advisory committee 27shall serve without compensation. Page 3 of 4 HLS 201ES-244 ORIGINAL HCR NO. 15 DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] HCR 15 Original 2020 First Extraordinary Session Freeman Creates the Special Advisory Committee for Redistricting to study and make recommendations to the legislature and the public regarding redistricting including past redistricting proceedings, best redistricting practices established in other states, redistricting tools and resources including digital map-drawing tools, redistricting algorithms, and other technological resources, and proposed redistricting plans. Requires the committee to make a report to the legislature no later than March 1, 2021 and dissolves the committee on Dec. 31, 2021. Page 4 of 4