House
|
06/30/2020
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2020
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2020
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2020
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2020
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2020
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2020
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2020
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2020
|
Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 98, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2020
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/25/20.
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2020
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2020
|
Reported with amendments (9-0).
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2020
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|