House
|
06/26/2020
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2020
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2020
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2020
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2020
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2020
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2020
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2020
|
Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 95, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2020
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/17/20.
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2020
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2020
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/16/20.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2020
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2020
|
Reported favorably (10-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2020
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|