LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2020 1st Special Session
House
Bills
HR42
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HR42
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2020 1st Special Session
Louisiana House Bill HR42
Action History
House
06/30/2020
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
House
06/29/2020
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
House
06/25/2020
Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0. The resolution was adopted.
House
06/24/2020
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/25/20.
House
06/24/2020
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
House
06/23/2020
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.