LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2020 1st Special Session
House
Bills
HSR1
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HSR1
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2020 1st Special Session
Louisiana House Bill HSR1
Action History
House
06/16/2020
Approved on 6/16/2020.
House
06/11/2020
Study request list distributed to members on 6/11/2020.
House
06/11/2020
Received on 6/10/2020.