Senate
|
07/13/2020
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2020
|
Becomes Act No. 38
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2020
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2020
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2020
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2020
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2020
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2020
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 3. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/25/20.
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2020
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2020
|
Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2020
|
Reported with amendments (18-0).
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2020
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2020
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2020
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2020
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2020
|
Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2020
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2020
|
Read by title. By a vote of 23 yeas and 14 nays, the bill failed to receive the required two-thirds vote.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2020
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2020
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|