Senate
|
07/13/2020
|
Effective date 8/29/2020.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2020
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2020
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2020
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2020
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2020
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 3 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2020
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 2. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/23/20.
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2020
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2020
|
Reported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2020
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2020
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2020
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2020
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2020
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|