Senate
|
07/13/2020
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2020
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2020
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2020
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2020
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2020
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2020
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2020
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 3. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/25/20.
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2020
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2020
|
Reported with amendments (18-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2020
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2020
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2020
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2020
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2020
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2020
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|