Senate
|
07/13/2020
|
Effective date 1/1/2021.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2020
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2020
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2020
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2020
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2020
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2020
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/18/20.
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2020
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2020
|
Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2020
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2020
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2020
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2020
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|