Senate
|
07/13/2020
|
Effective date 7/13/2020.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2020
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2020
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2020
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2020
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2020
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2020
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 19. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/24/20.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2020
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2020
|
Reported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2020
|
Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2020
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 26 yeas and 8 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2020
|
Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2020
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|