House | 06/29/2020 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 06/28/2020 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 06/24/2020 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 21 yeas and 17 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 06/24/2020 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/19/2020 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2020 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 06/17/2020 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 06/15/2020 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2020 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |