House | 06/29/2020 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 06/25/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/29/20. | ||
House | 06/25/2020 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 06/25/2020 | Rules suspended. | ||
House | 06/25/2020 | Reported with amendments (13-0). | ||
House | 06/23/2020 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 06/22/2020 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. | ||
House | 06/22/2020 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 06/19/2020 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2020 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 06/17/2020 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | ||
Senate | 06/16/2020 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |