Senate | 06/11/2020 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/10/2020. | ||
House | 06/09/2020 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2020 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2020 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 06/08/2020 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted. | ||
House | 06/05/2020 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2020 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 27 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |