Senate
|
06/30/2020
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2020
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2020
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2020
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2020
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 99 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/25/20.
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2020
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2020
|
Discharged from the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2020
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2020
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2020
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2020
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2020
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2020
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2020
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|