Senate | 06/30/2020 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020. | ||
House | 06/23/2020 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2020 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 06/19/2020 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 06/18/2020 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | ||
House | 06/18/2020 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2020 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 06/17/2020 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |