Senate | 06/30/2020 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020. | ||
House | 06/30/2020 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2020 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2020 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 06/30/2020 | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 92 yeas, 0 nays. | ||
House | 06/29/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/30/20. | ||
House | 06/29/2020 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 06/29/2020 | Rules suspended. | ||
House | 06/29/2020 | Reported favorably (22-0). | ||
House | 06/29/2020 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 06/28/2020 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2020 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 06/24/2020 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |