Senate
|
06/30/2020
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020.
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2020
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2020
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2020
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2020
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 95 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/30/20.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2020
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2020
|
Reported favorably (12-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2020
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2020
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2020
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2020
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2020
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|