Senate
|
10/22/2020
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
10/22/2020
|
House conferees appointed: Frieman, Garofalo, and Seabaugh.
|
|
|
House
|
10/22/2020
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/22/2020
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Fields, Cathey, and Mizell.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/22/2020
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
10/22/2020
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
10/22/2020
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/22/2020
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
House
|
10/22/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/21/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/21/2020
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/13/2020
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
10/13/2020
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 67, nays 29. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 10/13/20.
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2020
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2020
|
Reported with amendments (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
09/28/2020
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|