Senate
|
10/22/2020
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/22/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/21/2020
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/20/2020
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/14/2020
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
10/14/2020
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 79, nays 12. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
10/14/2020
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
10/13/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 10/14/20.
|
|
|
House
|
10/13/2020
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
10/13/2020
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 10/13/20.
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2020
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2020
|
Reported favorably (15-0).
|
|
|
House
|
09/28/2020
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|