House
|
10/28/2020
|
Effective date: 1/01/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
10/28/2020
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 22.
|
|
|
House
|
10/23/2020
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/23/2020
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
10/22/2020
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
10/22/2020
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
10/22/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
10/22/2020
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/22/2020
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/21/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/21/2020
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/20/2020
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/20/2020
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/14/2020
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|
House
|
10/14/2020
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
10/13/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 10/14/20.
|
|
|
House
|
10/13/2020
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2020
|
Reported with amendments (10-0).
|
|
|
House
|
09/30/2020
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|