Senate | 10/13/2020 | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. | ||
House | 10/13/2020 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 66, nays 24. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 10/12/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 10/13/20. | ||
House | 10/12/2020 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 10/07/2020 | Reported favorably (6-3). | ||
House | 09/28/2020 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 09/28/2020 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 09/25/2020 | Prefiled. |