Senate | 10/14/2020 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. | ||
Senate | 10/13/2020 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 10/12/2020 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 62, nays 33. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 10/12/2020 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 10/06/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 10/12/20. | ||
House | 10/06/2020 | Notice given. | ||
House | 10/06/2020 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 10/05/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 10/06/20. | ||
House | 10/05/2020 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 10/05/2020 | Rules suspended. | ||
House | 10/05/2020 | Reported favorably (12-5). | ||
House | 09/29/2020 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |