House
|
10/27/2020
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/23/2020
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
10/22/2020
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
10/22/2020
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
10/22/2020
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/22/2020
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
House
|
10/22/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/21/2020
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/14/2020
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/13/2020
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
10/13/2020
|
Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 97, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 10/13/20.
|
|
|
House
|
10/06/2020
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
10/06/2020
|
Discharged from the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2020
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2020
|
Reported favorably (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
10/01/2020
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|