Senate | 10/15/2020 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. | ||
Senate | 10/14/2020 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 10/14/2020 | Read third time by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 99, nays 0. The resolution, having the required two-thirds vote of the elected members, was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 10/13/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 10/14/20. | ||
House | 10/13/2020 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 10/12/2020 | Reported favorably (12-0). | ||
House | 10/01/2020 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |