House | 10/20/2020 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 10/19/2020 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 10/19/2020 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 10/15/2020 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 10/15/2020 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 24 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 10/15/2020 | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. | ||
Senate | 10/14/2020 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | ||
Senate | 10/13/2020 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 10/13/2020 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 70, nays 17. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 10/12/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 10/13/20. | ||
House | 10/12/2020 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 10/12/2020 | Discharged from the Committee on Judiciary. | ||
House | 10/05/2020 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |