House | 10/23/2020 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 10/22/2020 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 10/22/2020 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 10/22/2020 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 10/22/2020 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 10/22/2020 | Rules suspended. | ||
Senate | 10/21/2020 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 10/20/2020 | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. | ||
House | 10/20/2020 | Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 85, nays 9. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 10/19/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 10/20/20. | ||
House | 10/19/2020 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 10/19/2020 | Reported favorably (19-0). | ||
House | 10/14/2020 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |