House
|
10/27/2020
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/23/2020
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
10/23/2020
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
10/23/2020
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
10/22/2020
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 10/23/20.
|
|
|
House
|
10/22/2020
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/22/2020
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/22/2020
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/22/2020
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/22/2020
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/22/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/22/2020
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/21/2020
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|
House
|
10/21/2020
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 66, nays 19. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
10/20/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 10/21/20.
|
|
|
House
|
10/20/2020
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
10/20/2020
|
Discharged from the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2020
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|