Senate | 10/13/2020 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 10/13/2020 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. | ||
Senate | 10/13/2020 | Rules suspended. | ||
Senate | 10/12/2020 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 10/07/2020 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | ||
Senate | 10/06/2020 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 10/05/2020 | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. | ||
House | 10/02/2020 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 66, nays 22. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 10/01/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 10/02/20. | ||
House | 10/01/2020 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 10/01/2020 | Reported favorably (15-0-1). | ||
House | 09/29/2020 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |