House | 10/15/2020 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 10/14/2020 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 10/13/2020 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 10/12/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 10/13/20. | ||
House | 10/12/2020 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 10/07/2020 | Reported favorably (15-0). | ||
House | 09/28/2020 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |