House | 10/20/2020 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 10/19/2020 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 10/15/2020 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 86, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 10/14/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 10/15/20. | ||
House | 10/14/2020 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 10/14/2020 | Rules suspended. | ||
House | 10/14/2020 | Reported with amendments (15-0). | ||
House | 10/13/2020 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |