Senate
|
11/05/2020
|
Effective date 1/1/2021.
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/05/2020
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 50.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/21/2020
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 10/16/2020.
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2020
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/19/2020
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 10/16/2020.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/15/2020
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/14/2020
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
10/14/2020
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
10/13/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 10/14/20.
|
|
|
House
|
10/13/2020
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
10/13/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
10/13/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
10/13/2020
|
Reported with amendments (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
10/06/2020
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/06/2020
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/05/2020
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/28/2020
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/24/2020
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|