Senate
|
10/16/2020
|
Effective date 10/16/2020.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2020
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/12/2020
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 10/8/2020.
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2020
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/12/2020
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 10/8/2020.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/07/2020
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
10/06/2020
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 10/06/20.
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2020
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2020
|
Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
10/01/2020
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/30/2020
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/29/2020
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/28/2020
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|