Senate
|
10/28/2020
|
Effective date 7/1/2021.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/28/2020
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 37.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/23/2020
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
10/23/2020
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/22/2020
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/22/2020
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/21/2020
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
10/21/2020
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
10/21/2020
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
10/21/2020
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
10/20/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 10/21/20.
|
|
|
House
|
10/20/2020
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
10/20/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
10/20/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
10/20/2020
|
Reported with amendments. (14-0) Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
10/13/2020
|
Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/13/2020
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/12/2020
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/29/2020
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|