Senate
|
10/22/2020
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
10/21/2020
|
House conferees appointed: Zeringue, Magee, and Stefanski.
|
|
|
House
|
10/21/2020
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/21/2020
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: White, Tarver, and Cloud.
|
|
|
House
|
10/21/2020
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/21/2020
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/20/2020
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
10/20/2020
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
10/20/2020
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
10/20/2020
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 10/20/20.
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2020
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2020
|
Reported with amendments (18-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
10/14/2020
|
Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/13/2020
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/12/2020
|
Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 1 for 10/13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/12/2020
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/29/2020
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|