Senate
|
10/28/2020
|
Effective date 10/28/2020.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/28/2020
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 44.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/23/2020
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
10/23/2020
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/22/2020
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/21/2020
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
10/21/2020
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 72, nays 15. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
10/20/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 10/21/20.
|
|
|
House
|
10/20/2020
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
10/20/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
10/20/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
10/20/2020
|
Reported favorably (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2020
|
Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/14/2020
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/13/2020
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/12/2020
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|