Senate | 10/23/2020 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 10/26/2020. | ||
House | 10/23/2020 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 10/21/2020 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 10/20/2020 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 10/20/2020 | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 97 yeas, 0 nays. | ||
House | 10/19/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 10/20/20. | ||
House | 10/19/2020 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 10/19/2020 | Discharged from the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 10/12/2020 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
Senate | 10/07/2020 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 10/06/2020 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 10/05/2020 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |