Senate
|
10/23/2020
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 10/26/2020.
|
|
|
House
|
10/23/2020
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/21/2020
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/20/2020
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
10/20/2020
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 97 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
10/20/2020
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 10/20/20.
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2020
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2020
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 10/19/20.
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2020
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2020
|
Reported favorably (13-0).
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
10/14/2020
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|
House
|
10/14/2020
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/13/2020
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered re-reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/12/2020
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/06/2020
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended, read by title, committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/05/2020
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/05/2020
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/30/2020
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|