Senate
|
10/23/2020
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 10/26/2020.
|
|
|
House
|
10/23/2020
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/21/2020
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/20/2020
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
10/20/2020
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 98, nays 0. The resolution, having the required two-thirds vote of the elected members, was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 10/20/20.
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2020
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2020
|
Reported favorably (19-0).
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2020
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2020
|
Discharged from the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|
House
|
10/14/2020
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|
House
|
10/14/2020
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/13/2020
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/12/2020
|
Rules suspended. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/12/2020
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/06/2020
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/05/2020
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|