LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2020 2nd Special Session
Senate
Bills
SR22
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SR22
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2020 2nd Special Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR22
Action History
Senate
10/23/2020
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 10/26/2020.
Senate
10/20/2020
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted.
Senate
10/19/2020
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
Senate
10/15/2020
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Senate
10/14/2020
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.