Senate | 05/18/2020 | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. | ||
House | 05/15/2020 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 67, nays 32. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/13/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20. | ||
House | 05/13/2020 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/07/2020 | Reported favorably (20-0). | ||
House | 03/09/2020 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 02/24/2020 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2020. | ||
House | 02/20/2020 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 02/20/2020 | Prefiled. |