House | 05/22/2020 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 28, nays 59. Failed to pass. | ||
House | 05/20/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20. | ||
House | 05/18/2020 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/15/2020 | Reported favorably (10-0). | ||
House | 03/09/2020 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 02/24/2020 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2020. | ||
House | 02/20/2020 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 02/20/2020 | Prefiled. |