House
|
06/04/2020
|
Effective date: 06/04/2020.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2020
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 21.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2020
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2020
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2020
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2020
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2020
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2020
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2020
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2020
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/20.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2020
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2020
|
Reported favorably (13-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2020
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2020
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2020.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2020
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2020
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|