Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2020
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2020
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2020
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2020
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 81, nays 10. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/21/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2020
|
Reported favorably (13-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2020
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2020
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2020.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2020
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2020
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|