House
|
06/09/2020
|
Effective date: 08/01/20.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2020
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 99.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2020
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 25 yeas and 8 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 28 yeas and 4 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2020
|
By a vote of 95 yeas, 0 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2020
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 22. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2020
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2020
|
Reported favorably (10-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2020
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2020
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2020.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2020
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2020
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|