House
|
05/28/2020
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2020
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 62, nays 30. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/27/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2020
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2020
|
Reported without amendments (12-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2020
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2020
|
Reported favorably (10-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2020
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2020
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2020.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2020
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2020
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|