Senate | 05/18/2020 | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. | ||
House | 05/15/2020 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/13/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20. | ||
House | 05/13/2020 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/07/2020 | Reported with amendments (10-0). | ||
House | 03/09/2020 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. | ||
House | 01/24/2020 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/24/2020. | ||
House | 01/24/2020 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. | ||
House | 01/24/2020 | Prefiled. |