House | 05/22/2020 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/20/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20. | ||
House | 05/18/2020 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/15/2020 | Reported favorably (11-5). | ||
House | 03/09/2020 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. | ||
House | 02/26/2020 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. | ||
House | 02/26/2020 | Prefiled. |