Senate | 05/25/2020 | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. | ||
House | 05/22/2020 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 78, nays 18. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/20/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20. | ||
House | 05/18/2020 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/15/2020 | Reported favorably (11-4). | ||
House | 03/09/2020 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. | ||
House | 02/26/2020 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. | ||
House | 02/26/2020 | Prefiled. |